THE TIME TO SHINE PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides high-quality music projects for individuals who are socially excluded, with the aim of increasing social inclusion and developing self-confidence, self-respect, trust and self-belief. The charity operates primarily in south east England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Camden
- East Sussex
- Kent
Governance
- 07 May 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANET ANNE ALLEN | Chair | 26 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Angela Wragg | Trustee | 08 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Tolhurst | Trustee | 28 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Grant | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ashleigh Devlin | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Millican Patel | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN CURTIS NEWLAN | Trustee | 06 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Johnson | Trustee | 06 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Jane Cecilia Kendal | Trustee | 05 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ALUN PRICE | Trustee | 26 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.03k | £10.67k | £12.54k | £11.74k | £11.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.12k | £8.28k | £9.34k | £10.04k | £3.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 11 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 11 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 May 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL AND MENTAL);SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; RESPONSIBILITIES AS A CARER; DISABILITY OR ETHNIC ORIGIN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Park Lane
Kemsing
SEVENOAKS
Kent
TN15 6NU
- Phone:
- 07984 016800
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window