Financial history SIKH TEMPLE TRUST, NOTTINGHAM

Charity number: 512435
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £597.00k £316.92k £417.84k £405.11k £391.46k
Total expenditure £183.11k £173.01k £127.07k £146.73k £257.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £18.72k £19.24k N/A £35.98k
Income - Donations and legacies £546.49k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £50.50k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £169.09k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £14.02k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £35.85k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £14.02k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A