SIKH TEMPLE TRUST, NOTTINGHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of the Sikh faith in Nottingham City and Nottinghamshire through the teaching, preaching and celebration of the Sikh Faith and principles. To promote inclusion of all members in activities that bring the membership together to promote the ideals of Sikh Faith. To provide services and activities in line with the Sikh faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £35,983 from 2 government grant(s)
People

16 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 23 March 1982: Standard registration
- GURDWARA SRI GURU SINGH SABHA (SIKH TEMPLE) (Working name)
- S R I GURU SINGH SABHA GURDAWARA SIKH TEMPLE TRUST NOTTINGHAM (Working name)
- SIKH TEMPLE TRUST (GURDAWARA) (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SURJIT SINGH JOHAL-Chairman | Chair | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anokh Singh | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chander Parkash Saini Vice-Treasurer | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harjinder Singh Rai-Stage Secretary and Secretary | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amrik Singh Mahil | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mandeep Singh | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Balraj Singh Sanghera - General Secretary | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
GURJEET SINGH PURAWAL | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
HARBHAJAN SINGH BAWA Incharge of Kitchen | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
SURIDER KAUR SAMRA | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gurlaal Singh Hayer | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gurjeet Singh Sandhu | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karamvir Singh Takhar | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jaswant Singh Dhillon - Treasurer | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
HOLDING TRUSTEE LASHKAR BILAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HOLDING TRUSTEE RESHAM SAMRA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £597.00k | £316.92k | £417.84k | £405.11k | £391.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £183.11k | £173.01k | £127.07k | £146.73k | £257.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.72k | £19.24k | N/A | £35.98k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £546.49k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £50.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £169.09k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £14.02k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £35.85k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £14.02k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 July 2023 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 July 2023 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 September 2021 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 September 2021 | 91 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 04 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 04 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 1 DECEMBER 1981 AS VARIED BY A SCHEME OF 8 SEPTEMBER 1982 AND ORDER OF 15 AUGUST 2003.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE SIKH RELIGION IN THE CITY OF NOTTINGHAM BY THE MAINTENANCE OF A TEMPLE FOR WORSHIP, THE CELEBRATION OF SUCH RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, AND THE CONDUCT OF BAPTISM, MARRIAGE AND FUNERAL RITES IN ACCORDANCE WITH SIKH RELIGIOUS OBSERVANCES, AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTESS THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
CITY OF NOTTINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 Nottingham Rd
Basford
NOTTINGHAM
NG7 7AE
- Phone:
- No information available
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window