TAUNTON FESTIVAL O F THE ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our Festival organises Music, Dance and Speech and Drama festivals , competitions and other occasional concerts and events for the people of Taunton and its locality.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Somerset
Governance
- 06 July 2018: CIO registration
- 18 July 2018: Funds received from 900556 TAUNTON AND SOMERSET MUSIC AND DRAMA FESTIVAL
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heather Jayne Hornsby | Chair | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Jane Rippin | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Jayne Sewell | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Eve Smith | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Ann Cresswell | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Christine Nicola Beattie | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Wilson McRae Porter MBE | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Alice Porter | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JAMES WHITFIELD CHAPMAN | Trustee | 06 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 10/09/2020 | 10/09/2021 | 10/09/2022 | 10/09/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.01k | £1.81k | £33.46k | £20.06k | £24.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.57k | £1.41k | £23.08k | £22.27k | £22.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.26k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 21 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 21 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 10 September 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 September 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 10 September 2022 | 24 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 September 2022 | 24 December 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 10 September 2021 | 09 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 September 2021 | 09 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 10 September 2020 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 September 2020 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 06 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
THE CIO'S OBJECT IS TO ADVANCE, PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE PERFORMING ARTS GENERALLY AND, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MUSIC, DANCE AND SPEECH AND DRAMA. IT SEEKS TO ACHIEVE THE OBJECT BY ORGANISING FESTIVALS, COMPETITIONS AND OTHER OCCASIONAL CONCERTS, PERFORMANCES, WORKSHOPS OR SUCH LIKE EVENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 Clifford Avenue
TAUNTON
Somerset
TA2 6DJ
- Phone:
- 07848850388
- Email:
- info@tauntonfestival.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window