Financial history C A ROOKES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 512437
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £62.24k £166.81k £200.16k £61.84k £197.14k
Total expenditure £57.97k £50.95k £69.50k £65.70k £70.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A