SPRINGWOOD CHURCH, OAKWOOD (FORMERLY WOODLANDS CHURCH ON OAKWOOD)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The actives of the charity are: - Providing place of worship with regular Sunday services at Parkview Primary school, Oakwood DE21 2RQ - Generally advancing the religion by preaching the gospel, organising bible studies, public worship, prayer meetings, evangelistic events and meeting the needs of the community. - Educating people about the religion and supporting the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 06 September 2018: CIO registration
- 04 November 2022: Removed (Removed by application)
- 04 November 2022: Funds transferred to 254766 ALLESTREE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP
- 04 November 2022: Funds transferred to 1140235 DERBY CITY MISSION LIMITED
- 04 November 2022: Funds transferred to 1124015 NEW HOPE FOR CHILDREN
- SPRINGWOOD CHURCH (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.73k | £78.73k | £37.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.55k | £46.55k | £38.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 26 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 26 June 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
3.1.1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH, PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, WITHIN OAKWOOD, DERBYSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD; AND 3.1.2. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE CHARITY TRUSTEES, PUT INTO PRACTICE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS; THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; PROVIDED THAT THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH PURPOSES MUST BE UNDERTAKEN IN A MANNER THAT IS CONSISTENT WITH THE DOCTRINAL DISTINCTIVES AND ETHICAL STATEMENTS AS MAY BE ADOPTED AND AMENDED BY THE CIO FROM TIME TO TIME.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window