RESOLVEN MINERS' WELFARE SCHEME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Draft Mission Statement: Resolven Miners Welfare Scheme aims to work for the benefit of Resolven and surrounds; by providing opportunities for personal development of local residents, promotion of education, health, wellbeing, culture and heritage; with a view to seeking a brighter and healthier future for all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Neath Port Talbot
Governance
- 24 May 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sian Julia Jackson | Chair | 24 May 2019 |
|
|||
Richard Greg Williams | Trustee | 31 August 2022 |
|
|||
Chloe Jayne Addiscott | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|||
Kieron Sims | Trustee | 24 May 2019 |
|
|||
Mark Griffiths | Trustee | 24 May 2019 |
|
|||
Robert Sims | Trustee | 24 May 2019 |
|
|||
Dean Lewis | Trustee | 24 May 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 September 2023 | 329 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 September 2023 | 329 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 September 2021 | 318 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 September 2021 | 318 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 May 2019
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF A WELFARE HALL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS (AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, SUCH OF THE SAID INHABITANTS AS ARE MEMBERS OF THE MINING COMMUNITY) OF RESOLVEN AND SURROUNDING AREA (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Resolven Miners Welfare Association
Neath Road
Resolven
NEATH
West Glamorgan
SA11 4AH
- Phone:
- 01639710320
- Email:
- info@resolvenwelfare.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window