Financial history DUNKESWELL PRE-SCHOOL CIO

Charity Number: 1179461
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £137.57k £85.90k £77.95k £82.82k £87.15k
Total expenditure £74.15k £57.05k £88.74k £80.43k £88.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £600 N/A N/A