Accounts and annual returns WONDERFUL GOSPEL MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1180439
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 09 February 2024 07 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 09 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 09 February 2023 29 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 09 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 09 February 2022 14 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 09 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 09 February 2021 23 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 09 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 09 February 2020 07 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 09 February 2020 Not Required