Financial history WONDERFUL GOSPEL MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1180439
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 09/02/2020 09/02/2021 09/02/2022 09/02/2023 09/02/2024
Total gross income £5.17k £3.86k £11.47k £949 £20.04k
Total expenditure £4.96k £3.01k £10.92k £911 £18.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A