MUSLIM COMMUNITY CENTRE WANSTEAD (''MCCW'')

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Islamic faith for the benefit of the public by providing facilities for prayer, celebration and Islamic observance. The advancement of education including the advancement of Islamic religious education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Redbridge
Governance
- 13 September 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MUHAMMAD SIDDIQUE | Chair | 15 October 2017 |
|
|||||
Ashrafur Rahman | Trustee | 30 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zulfiqar Ahmed | Trustee | 29 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
NAEEM ASHRAF RANA | Trustee | 07 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Syed Shahriar | Trustee | 07 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
ARSHAD T QURESHI | Trustee | 07 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALI MUHAMMAD QURESHI | Trustee | 15 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Abdul Waheed | Trustee | 15 October 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.54k | £2.77k | £9.39k | £13.14k | £17.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.89k | £1.95k | £4.24k | £9.15k | £10.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PRAYER, CELEBRATION AND ISLAMIC OBSERVANCE; THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION INCLUDING THE ADVANCEMENT OF ISLAMIC RELIGIOUS EDUCATION; TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE WANSTEAD AND ITS SURROUNDINGS IN LONDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 FELSTEAD ROAD
LONDON
E11 2QJ
- Phone:
- 07730718340
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window