The Brian May Archive of Stereoscopy

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Acquires and preserves stereoscopic images and equipment, devices and other related materials. To advance the education of the public on the subject of stereoscopic photography.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 10 July 2019: CIO registration
- LONDON STEREOSCOPIC ARCHIVE (Previous name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lindsey Sutherland Stewart | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN HAROLD MAY PHD | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
LOUISA WINTER | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
EMILY MAY ALFORD | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr MICHAEL PRITCHARD FRPS DGPH | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £351.60k | £159.43k | £1.03m | £193.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £170.70k | £134.71k | £178.39k | £187.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £1.03m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £178.39k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £2.88k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Jul 2019 as amended on 21 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1. TO PRESERVE AND CONSERVE FOR THE NATION A UNIQUE COLLECTION OF STEREOSCOPIC IMAGES AND DEVICES AND OTHER RELATED MATERIALS (THE 'ARCHIVE'), REPRESENTING A SIGNIFICANT PART OF BRITAIN'S HERITAGE OF STEREOSCOPIC (3-D) PHOTOGRAPHY, CREATED FROM THE 1850S ONWARDS. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL (AND PARTICULARLY RESEARCH STUDENTS) ON THE SUBJECT OF STEREOSCOPIC PHOTOGRAPHY IN ENGLAND AND ELSEWHERE AND PROVIDE ACCESS TO THE ARCHIVE TO THOSE RESEARCHING THIS AREA FOR EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALLERTON HILL
WESTWOOD ROAD
WINDLESHAM
GU20 6LS
- Phone:
- 07879697461
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window