DALSTON AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 512445
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The main object of the charity is to promote the advancement of agriculture for the benefit of the public by providing the show field for Dalston Show (CIO and linked charity) to hold an annual show at Dalston.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £65,744
Total expenditure: £60,170

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Animals
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 February 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • DALSTON SHOW (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Anne Jackson Trustee 22 February 2023
None on record
DAVID HUGH BLACK Trustee 06 April 2019
None on record
IAN BLAMIRE Trustee 06 April 2019
None on record
CRAIG PHILIP BROUGH Trustee 06 April 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £36.72k £4.91k £4.76k £62.75k £65.74k
Total expenditure £53.08k £5.73k £3.29k £62.23k £60.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 04 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 12 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 March 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 14 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF AGRICULTURE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: 1) ENCOURAGING IMPROVEMENTS IN THE BREEDING OF STOCK, THE MANAGEMENT OF LAND AND IN THE GENERAL PROMOTION OF AGRICULTURE 2) ORGANISING AND PRESENTING THE ANNUAL DALSTON AGRICULTURAL SHOW.
Area of benefit
Registration history
  • 14 February 2019 : CIO registration

Contact information

Address:
National Farmers Union
Warwick Mill Business Park
Warwick Bridge
CARLISLE
CA4 8RR
Phone:
07534197221