THE EDUCATORS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supports and encourages the work of educators in all educational sectors: awards prizes, bursaries and grants, and sponsors talks and events which highlight matters of interest and concern to those involved in education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 July 2018: CIO registration
- 11 December 2023: Funds received from 1104355 THE EDUCATORS TRUST FUND
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Jennifer Somerville | Chair | 26 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anne-Maria Brennan | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Hilary Ruth Hodgson | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Ruth Margaret Briant | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Jasmine Dotiwala | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Enid Weaver | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Bowers Isaacson | Trustee | 02 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor David Ingle Skidmore | Trustee | 02 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Bence-Trower | Trustee | 21 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sir Deian Hopkin | Trustee | 26 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Peter Robert Williams CBE | Trustee | 26 July 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £27.19k | £16.16k | £115.48k | £14.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £10.93k | £19.57k | £23.85k | £25.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 March 2025 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 March 2025 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
1) TO REWARD EXCELLENCE AND INNOVATION IN THEIR ACHIEVEMENT AND TRAINING IN ORDER TO ENCOURAGE BOTH STUDENTS AND THEIR MENTORS TO UNDERTAKE, AND THE PUBLIC TO APPRECIATE, THE WORK OF EDUCATORS. 2) TO PROMOTE, BY THE AWARD OF BURSARIES AND GRANTS AND OTHER APPROPRIATE MEANS, THE DEVELOPMENT OF EDUCATORS THROUGH RESEARCH AND STUDY THAT IS APPROPRIATE TO THE PROFESSION OF EDUCATOR AND THAT INCREASES UNDERSTANDING OF RELEVANT OPPORTUNITIES AND NEEDS. 3) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO EDUCATION AND ITS DELIVERY THROUGH PROMOTION OF PUBLIC PRESENTATIONS AND DISCUSSIONS OF RELEVANT DEVELOPMENTS; AND THE GENERATION OF REPORTS TO POLICY MAKING BODIES AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Worshipful Company of Educators
8 Little Trinity Lane
London
EC4V 2AN
- Phone:
- 0207 489 7779
- Email:
- chair@educatorstrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window