Accounts and annual returns HOPE FOUNDATION UK LIMITED

Charity number: 1182078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 06 February 2025 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2023 25 November 2024 298 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2022 25 November 2024 663 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2021 12 April 2022 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2020 12 April 2022 435 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Not Required