LONDON IRISH FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The London Irish Foundation uses the power of sport, rugby in particular, to make a lasting, positive impact on the lives of people, both young and old, and to build a meaningful and sustainable legacy for sport and education across our communities, in Berkshire, Hampshire, Middlesex and Surrey. Our key work strands are rugby development, education, community engagement and inclusion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £118,503 from 2 government contract(s) and £2,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bracknell Forest
- Hampshire
- Surrey
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 16 April 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patrick Lennon | Chair | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Francesca Boorman | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ray Brown | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Alli | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Topsy Ojo | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy William Brownlee | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £362.16k | £291.94k | £257.56k | £248.12k | £190.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £255.40k | £237.92k | £250.49k | £221.06k | £258.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £11.00k | N/A | £6.45k | £118.50k | |
|
Income from government grants | £37.71k | £39.04k | £14.74k | £18.93k | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 01 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 01 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 07 May 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 07 May 2021 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 MAY 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S (OBJECTS) ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY, BOTH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS, AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE INHABITANTS OF BERKSHIRE, HAMPSHIRE, MIDDLESEX AND SURREY AND THEIR SURROUNDING AREAS: 1.1 TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF RUGBY AND OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH (FACILITIES IN THIS ARTICLE 3 MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES); 1.2 TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 1.3 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE AND PROMOTE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH THROUGH HEALTHY RECREATION AND SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT; 1.4 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING ACADEMIC, SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL EDUCATION) OF CHILDREN AND OTHER PERSONS THROUGH SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT; AND 1.5 FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN EACH CASE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hazelwood Centre
Hazelwood Avenue
SUNBURY-ON-THAMES
Middlesex
TW16 6QU
TW16 6QU
- Phone:
- 01932750100
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window