CHANNEL 1 NEWPORT HOSPITAL RADIO
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hospital Radio Broadcasting Station operating within the Royal Gwent Hospital Newport, serving patients and staff from the South Gwent area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Monmouthshire
- Newport City
- Torfaen
Governance
- 23 March 1982: Standard registration
- 14 December 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- 14 December 2019: Funds transferred to 1098728 ANEURIN BEVAN UNIVERSITY LOCAL HEALTH BOARD CHARIT...
- ROYAL GWENT HOSPITAL RADIO (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2013 | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.33k | £960 | £2.15k | £321 | £831 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.45k | £1.31k | £1.40k | £1.34k | £1.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | 22 February 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2016 | 14 April 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 NOVEMBER 1981
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS INFIRMITY AND OLD AGE AMONGST PERSONS LIVING IN NEWPORT GWENT, BY PROVIDING A LOCAL BROADCASTING SERVICE FOR HOSPITALS AND SIMILAR INSTITUTIONS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE CONSTITUTION)
Area of benefit
THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE ROYAL GWENT HOSPITAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window