Trustees NORTHCHURCH & BERKHAMSTED UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity number: 1179473

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
YVONNE IRENE LARKINS | Chair | 08 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Hewitt | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Lee | Trustee | 25 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Newton | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sue Rees | Trustee | 30 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOAN MARGARET LUTHER | Trustee | 08 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
GLORIA EVELYN BUDD | Trustee | 08 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ELIZABETH ARMSTRONG | Trustee | 04 January 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARY RUTH WOODWARD | Trustee | 04 January 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANNE COX | Trustee | 04 January 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.