THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES FLETCHAMSTEAD COVENTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £880 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Coventry City
Governance
- 16 October 2018: Standard registration
- ST JAMES FLETCHAMSTEAD PCC, COVENTRY (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIMOTHY HUGH POLLARD | Chair | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marlene Mary Pearson | Trustee | 15 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Alison Clayden | Trustee | 15 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Trecia Anne Davidson | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Howard Cuttler | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Desmond Stuart French | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
ARTHUR JOHN STREET | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
HELEN DENISE KEARNEY | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr EMMANUEL DAVIDSON | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £112.97k | £123.85k | £115.65k | £120.68k | £112.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £116.40k | £114.45k | £100.70k | £109.86k | £127.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.17k | £4.07k | N/A | £880 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 January 2024 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 January 2024 | 67 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 December 2022 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 December 2022 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. James Vicarage
395 Tile Hill Lane
Tile Hill
Coventry
CV4 9DP
- Phone:
- 02476466262
- Email:
- admin@stjamesfletch.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window