BRIDGNORTH SENIOR CITIZENS' DAY CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The day centre is a meeting place for senior citizens of Bridgnorth and District. It provides light refreshments, organizes numerous outings for shopping and visits to places of interest. Holidays are also arranged, craft shows are held. The centre is run voluntarily by senior citizens.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Shropshire
Governance
- 23 April 1982: Standard registration
- 19 April 2018: Removed (Voluntary removal)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.65k | £10.99k | £12.41k | £16.68k | £13.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.36k | £11.02k | £12.83k | £12.91k | £11.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 MAY 1981
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE AGED IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS, OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE, WITHIN BRIDGNORTH AND DISTRICT.
Area of benefit
BRIDGNORTH AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window