ESTUARY AND MOUNTAIN MISSION AREA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical, in the Estuary and Mountain Mission Area, North East Wales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£744,298
Donations and legacies | £550.07k | |
Charitable activities | £56.96k | |
Other trading activities | £87.53k | |
Investments | £14.93k | |
Other | £34.81k |
Total expenditure:
£729,306
Raising funds | £2.42k | |
Charitable activities | £690.44k | |
Other | £36.44k |
£27,760 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £152,686 from 10 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £38.87k | |
Charitable expenditure | £690.44k | |
Retained for future use | £14.99k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £38.87k | |
Charitable expenditure | £690.44k | |
Retained for future use | £42.75k |
People

2 Employee(s)
26 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Flintshire
Governance
- 12 September 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
26 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Hooper | Chair | 01 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Sandra Williams | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrea De Vaal Horciu | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Eaton | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Moore | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Kathryn Rachel Hall | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ashley Griffiths | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev GARETH DAVID WILLIAMS | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Joan Hearty | Trustee | 24 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Dr Revd Hainsworth | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
CARRIE-ANN GREENWOOD | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
LORNA OWENS | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev DOMINIC AUSTIN CAWDELL OGS | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Fenney-Williams | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
MAVIS ALICE DAVIES-WRIGHT | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
JACKIE BLAIN | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
BETHAN HALL | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
LYNN FEARNHEAD | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAWN EVANS | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALISON KAY EVANS | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA MASSEY | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev HUGH NIGEL BURGESS | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|||||
YVONNE HEWITT | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
COLIN LEGG BA BSC FRH | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
IAN AUSTERBERRY | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
GABRIELA HUSBAND | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £482.42k | £266.34k | £378.23k | £651.98k | £744.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £483.84k | £254.83k | £446.62k | £771.32k | £729.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £152.69k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £399.54k | £550.07k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £134.78k | £87.53k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £50.96k | £56.96k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £15.53k | £14.93k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £51.17k | £34.81k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £32.50k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £709.85k | £690.44k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £644 | £2.42k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.55k | £797 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £60.82k | £36.44k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.89k | £4.89k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £781.81k | £702.68k | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £562.99k | £686.19k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £1.32k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 MAR 1920
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH, PASTORAL, EVANGELISTIC, SOCIAL AND ECUMENICAL, IN THE PARISH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Holy Trinity Church
Basingwerk Avenue
Greenfield
HOLYWELL
CH8 7JT
- Phone:
- 01352712030
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window