CLEVELEYS SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities and services. Serving and helping all who come through our doors. We raise funds for an external chosen charity each year. We donate, all collections of food taken at Harvest and Christmas, to our local food bank.. Help and advise all who may need counselling in any form whether bereavement or life difficulties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wrexham
Governance
- 20 June 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HELEN MARCIA TAYLOR | Chair | 08 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
CONSTANCE MEADOWS | Trustee | 08 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Smith | Trustee | 08 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
ANNETTE BARNES | Trustee | 08 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Joan Collins | Trustee | 08 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Shaw | Trustee | 08 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Carol Elvidge | Trustee | 08 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Estelle Livesey | Trustee | 08 March 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.06k | £5.27k | £11.03k | £10.77k | £14.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.77k | £6.04k | £4.91k | £9.06k | £10.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION AND THE RELIGIOUS PHILOSOPHY OF SPIRITUALISM ON THE BASIS OF THE SEVEN PRINCIPLES OF SNU SPIRITUALISM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
93
BEACH ROAD
THORNTON_CLEVELEYS
LANCASHIRE
FY5 1EW
- Phone:
- 07756967803
- Email:
- snu@snu.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window