Financial history SEVEN UP CHARITY

Charity number: 1179683
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £126.37k £136.53k £202.27k £205.38k £144.38k
Total expenditure £95.35k £145.53k £194.57k £200.93k £195.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A