MALVERN RADAR AND TECHNOLOGY HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We advance public knowledge of the scientific& cultural heritage arising from the government research establishments in and around Malvern. We help local educational bodies. We collect, preserve, protect and enrich the charity's archive material for public benefit. We restore artefacts associated with Malvern's scientific heritage. We cooperate with organisations with similar objectives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 April 2019: CIO registration
- MRATHS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Roger Appleby FInstP | Chair | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Humphrey | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Dennis John Williams PhD. | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Peter Gillham | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Darren James Coe | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Godfrey Hutchinson | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Henry | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lewis John Amphlett | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Charles Craven Williamson C Eng MIET | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Charles Burstow | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.83k | £5.40k | £23.37k | £12.68k | £11.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.17k | £4.07k | £11.45k | £10.46k | £9.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £3.21k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 16 Apr 2019 as amended on 18 Jan 2022 as amended on 23 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVE OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE SCIENTIFIC & CULTURAL HERITAGE ARISING FROM THE GOVERNMENT RESEARCH ESTABLISHMENTS IN AND AROUND MALVERN BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS:- A. EXHIBITIONS, LECTURES, TALKS, MEDIA AND PUBLICATIONS ETC. B. HELPING LOCAL EDUCATIONAL BODIES USE OUR HERITAGE TO PROMOTE STEM (SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY, ENGINEERING AND MATHEMATICS) AND MODERN HISTORY, PARTICULARLY AMONGST YOUNG PEOPLE. C. ENRICHING THE CHARITY’S ARCHIVE MATERIAL SO THAT IT CAN BE USED FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT. D. RESTORING HERITAGE ARTEFACTS ASSOCIATED WITH MALVERN’S SCIENTIFIC HERITAGE; AND E. WORKING IN CO-OPERATION WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS HAVING SIMILAR OBJECTIVES. 3.1.2. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Area of benefit
IN AND AROUND MALVERN
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Thomson & Bancks Solicitors
37 High Street
Pershore
Worcestershire
WR10 1AH
- Phone:
- 01386562000
- Email:
- Secretary@mraths.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window