HAMPTON PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion and practice of the Christian faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £20,600 from 5 government grant(s)
People

17 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 30 October 2018: Standard registration
- CHRIST THE SERVANT KING CHURCH, HAMPTON (Working name)
- CHRIST THE SERVANT KING HAMPTON (Working name)
- CSK (Working name)
- CSK HAMPTON (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carolyne Susan Walker | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Bubb | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Alan Cooke | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Burgess | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anna Louise Greenwood | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Deji Ogundapo | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Garfield | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine McLaren | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Michelle Goodes | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Burgess | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Leslie Harwood Clark | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Joel Gregory Wicks | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN EMMA GOOD | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER MARGARET DOWMAN | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ZSUZSA MESZAROS-KNIGHT | Trustee | 20 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Rachel Helen Hilditch | Trustee | 03 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
SALLY BRIGHT | Trustee | 10 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £184.34k | £169.81k | £205.21k | £198.05k | £191.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £193.52k | £161.06k | £228.89k | £163.73k | £201.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.46k | £3.00k | £13.50k | £20.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 December 2020 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 December 2020 | 33 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHRIST THE SERVANT KING CHURCH
SILVER HILL
HAMPTON CENTRE
PETERBOROUGH
PE7 8FF
- Phone:
- 01733248236
- Email:
- office@cskhampton.church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window