Accounts and annual returns BWNIS BORTHYN BUNNIES/CLWB BB CLUB
Charity Number: 1178880

Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 12 July 2024 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2023
(These accounts |
12 July 2024 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 08 July 2024 | 374 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 08 July 2024 | 374 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 October 2022 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2021
(These accounts |
18 October 2022 | 110 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 April 2022 | 303 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2020
(These accounts |
29 April 2022 | 303 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 28 April 2021 | 302 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 28 April 2021 | 302 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window