COMMUNITY LEGAL CENTRE ESSEX

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects are: 1) The relief of financial hardship by the provision of free legal advice and assistance to persons who through lack of means would otherwise be unable to access such services provided by a private practice and qualified legal representative or equivalent. 2) The advancement of the education of the public by increasing knowledge and understanding of the law.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 28 November 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew George Thorpe-Apps | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
RUSSELL MYNOTT | Trustee | 15 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP ROBERT ANDREW WILSON | Trustee | 15 June 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.92k | £37.31k | £38.22k | £94.19k | £124.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.25k | £27.05k | £34.95k | £75.21k | £65.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £54.92k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY THE PROVISION OF FREE LEGAL ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE TO PERSONS WHO THROUGH LACK OF MEANS WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNABLE TO ACCESS SUCH SERVICES. 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY INCREASING KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE LAW.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Citizens Advice Bureau
Burgess Well House
Coval Lane
CHELMSFORD
CM1 1FW
- Phone:
- 01245205601
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window