THE ALFRED STALEY MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As detailed in the charity's objects
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Derbyshire
- Nottinghamshire
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 24 April 2019: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Staley | Chair | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Anslow | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Wymark | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.24k | £744 | £575 | £1.01k | £1.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £600 | £624 | £730 | £720 | £719 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 09 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 06 FEB 2018
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE INCOME AND CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL, AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES OR IN SUCH MANNER TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS OR PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CROXALL HALL
CROXALL ROAD
CROXALL
LICHFIELD
WS13 8RA
- Phone:
- 01283791600
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window