Financial history THE NEW MOON RESCUE - TNR

Charity number: 1180018
Charity reporting is up to date (57 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £28.74k £65.35k £63.83k £81.98k £59.25k
Total expenditure £24.91k £41.85k £54.56k £79.80k £63.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A