THE NEW MOON RESCUE - TNR

Charity Number: 1180018
Charity reporting is up to date (57 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Feral and stray cat rescue

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £59,251
Total expenditure: £63,524

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 September 2018: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Heidi Dawn Sohail Chair 21 September 2018
None on record
Alicia Drewelus-Williams Trustee 23 October 2022
None on record
Helen Louise Taylor-Kelley Trustee 10 January 2022
None on record
Mary Chantal Starmore Trustee 08 September 2021
None on record
Kirsty Reader Trustee 27 January 2020
None on record
Hannah Claire Mansfield Trustee 27 January 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £28.74k £65.35k £63.83k £81.98k £59.25k
Total expenditure £24.91k £41.85k £54.56k £79.80k £63.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 25 September 2024 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 25 September 2024 57 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 30 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 30 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 17 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 17 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 25 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 25 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 19 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 19 April 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
125 Godstone Road
KENLEY
Surrey
CR8 5BD
Phone:
07394609384
Website:

Thenewmoonrescue.co.uk