Trustees THE NEW MOON RESCUE - TNR

Charity number: 1180018
Charity reporting is up to date (57 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Heidi Dawn Sohail Chair 21 September 2018
None on record
Alicia Drewelus-Williams Trustee 23 October 2022
None on record
Helen Louise Taylor-Kelley Trustee 10 January 2022
None on record
Mary Chantal Starmore Trustee 08 September 2021
None on record
Kirsty Reader Trustee 27 January 2020
None on record
Hannah Claire Mansfield Trustee 27 January 2020
None on record