Accounts and annual returns CHARLES CHIRISERI MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1180919
Charity reporting is overdue by 1655 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 194 days
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 194 days
Annual return 30 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 560 days
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 560 days
Annual return 30 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 925 days
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 925 days
Annual return 30 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1290 days
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1290 days
Annual return 30 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1655 days
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1655 days