MEDWAY AFRICAN AND CARIBBEAN ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run a weekly drop in for senior citizens. We hold an annual young Black achievers awards. We develop and deliver projects that promote diversity and celebrate heritage and culture. We work with partners across statutory, voluntary, private sectors to achieve our objectives. We work with young people with regards to culture, arts and education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £25,050 from 3 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
- Medway
Governance
- 14 August 2018: CIO registration
- 29 May 2020: Funds received from 1148026 MEDWAY AFRICAN AND CARIBBEAN ASSOCIATION
- MACA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Carol Stewart | Chair | 15 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Leslie | Trustee | 07 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lady Ima Ama Jane Brown | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Valentine | Trustee | 20 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Wendell Henry | Trustee | 15 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA COOPER | Trustee | 15 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Halpin | Trustee | 15 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Gayle | Trustee | 15 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.66k | £85.00k | £141.00k | £54.18k | £101.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.86k | £76.00k | £94.00k | £75.49k | £78.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.22k | £17.40k | £36.00k | £2.00k | £25.05k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Aug 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE: TO ADVANCE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF KENT AND MEDWAY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PERSONS OF THE AFRICAN-CARIBBEAN COMMUNITY, IN PARTICULAR ADVANCING EDUCATION AND/OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE SUNLIGHT DEVELOPMENT CENTRE
105 RICHMOND RD
GILLINGHAM
KENT
ME7 1LX
- Phone:
- 08448849502
- Email:
- info@macacharity.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window