Accounts and annual returns GRANTHAM OPERATIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 512490
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 05 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 12 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 24 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 01 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 16 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required