Accounts and annual returns THE ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF NAVENBY SCHOOL

Charity number: 512492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 15 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 02 July 2024 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 02 July 2024 398 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 08 June 2022 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 07 June 2021 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required