TIME TO TALK MENTAL HEALTH UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Time to Talk Mental Health UK is a fully confidential social media based peer support group for those suffering with mental health issues. We are run for and by people with mental health conditions aged 18 or over and living in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 14 November 2018: CIO registration
- TIME TO TALK UK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Carrington | Trustee | 29 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Celia Lythgoe | Trustee | 29 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
SUE THOMAS | Trustee | 16 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.30k | £2.53k | £9.57k | £2.46k | £2.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.23k | £1.49k | £5.42k | £4.74k | £1.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
1.TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS, INCLUDING BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY A)THE PROVISION OF AN ON-LINE PEER SUPPORT SERVICE, EVENTS, PRACTICAL ADVICE AND SUPPORT AND B)PROVIDING SUCH SERVICES, FACILITIES AND SUPPORT TO THOSE WHO ARE AT INCREASED RISK OF SUICIDE AS DEEMED APPROPRIATE. 2.THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, AND DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE. 3.THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF MENTAL HEALTH CONDITIONS. 4.TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MENTAL HEALTH AWARENESS BY WORKING TO INCREASE THE UNDERSTANDING OF MENTAL HEALTH AND MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES, GATHERING AND DISSEMINATING INFORMATION AND WORKING TO RAISE AWARENESS, PROMOTE UNDERSTANDING AND CHALLENGE STIGMA AND DISCRIMINATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 Sidegate Lane
IPSWICH
IP4 4HU
- Phone:
- 07939525272
- Email:
- admin@timetotalkuk.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window