ST CECILIA'S CHRISTIAN SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The church holds 3 weekly services, healing evenings, Friday healing, awareness groups. Monies raised help maintain the church. We hold events in order to help with the costs of running a church as generally the offerings would not cover this. Our Harvest Thanksgiving service food offerings are also donated to the homeless. Our Remembrance service donations are shared with The Royal British Legion
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 29 October 2018: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gerard Carter | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH BARRICK | Trustee | 31 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
KEVAN WILLIAM MAYNARD | Trustee | 31 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.50k | £4.74k | £16.14k | £24.57k | £17.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.59k | £3.46k | £8.57k | £18.63k | £12.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 MAY 2018 AS AMENDED ON 14 OCT 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION AND THE RELIGIOUS PHILOSOPHY OF SPIRITUALISM ON THE BASIS OF THE FOLLOWING PRINCIPLES: THE CHURCH ACCEPTS THE FOLLOWING PRINCIPLES: - 1. WE BELIEVE IN ONE GOD WHO IS LOVE. 2. WE ACCEPT THE LEADERSHIP OF JESUS CHRIST. 3. WE BELIEVE THAT GOD MANIFESTED THROUGH THE ILLIMITABLE POWER OF THE HOLY SPIRIT. 4. WE BELIEVE IN THE SURVIVAL OF THE HUMAN SOUL AND ITS INDIVIDUALITY AFTER PHYSICAL DEATH. 5. WE BELIEVE IN COMMUNION WITH GOD, WITH HIS ANGELIC MINISTERS, AND WITH SOULS FUNCTIONING IN CONDITIONS OTHER THAN AN EARTH-LIFE. 6. WE BELIEVE THAT ALL FORMS OF LIFE CREATED BY GOD INTERMINGLE, ARE INTERDEPENDENT AND EVOLVE UNTIL PERFECTION IS REACHED. 7. WE BELIEVE IN THE PERFECT JUSTICE OF THE DIVINE LAWS GOVERNING ALL LIFE. 8. WE BELIEVE THAT THE SINNER, THROUGH THE REDEMPTIVE POWER OF JESUS CHRIST AND REPENTANT SERVICE TO OTHERS, CAN ONLY RECTIFY SINS COMMITTED. PLEDGE: WE WILL AT ALL TIMES ENDEAVOUR TO BE GUIDED IN OUR THOUGHTS, WORDS AND DEEDS BY THE TEACHING AND EXAMPLE OF JESUS CHRIST
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 LORD ROBERTS AVENUE
LEIGH-ON-SEA
SS9 1ND
- Phone:
- 07812041826
- Email:
- st.cecilias47@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window