Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BANBURY ST MARY

Charity number: 1179456
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £129.25k £196.62k £127.25k £125.43k £135.23k
Total expenditure £121.70k £174.24k £127.20k £135.72k £140.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £44.44k £54.10k £511 N/A £16.15k