SWINDON CCRC TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A vibrant resourcing church with a vision to invite people into family to serve Swindon. A church that hope to engage with people who would not consider themselves to be church-goers and exists for the benefit of those outside the church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Swindon
Governance
- 06 December 2018: Standard registration
- PATTERN CHURCH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Joel Peter Sales | Chair | 19 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simbarashe Hakata | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Anne Oliver | Trustee | 15 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beth Trendell | Trustee | 15 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Thomas Woolley | Trustee | 15 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Kirkwood | Trustee | 15 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Katharine Smith | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £588.92k | £216.20k | £222.55k | £423.31k | £461.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £231.61k | £216.74k | £329.34k | £417.63k | £386.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £581.18k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £7.75k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £231.61k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 November 2020 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 November 2020 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITYÆS OBJECTS (THE "OBJECT") ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY, ONLY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION PRINCIPALLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF AN ANGLICAN PLACE OF WORSHIP IN SWINDON AND BY CONTRIBUTING TOWARDS THE ESTABLISHMENT, RENEWAL AND REVITALISATION OF CHURCHES WITHIN THE ANGLICAN COMMUNION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
114 East Wichel Way
SWINDON
SN1 7AE
- Phone:
- 07377880433
- Email:
- hello@patternchurch.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window