Financial history HEAVEN SEEKERS MINISTRY UK INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1180258
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £72.37k £124.53k £105.87k £92.90k £92.04k
Total expenditure £44.31k £131.91k £98.86k £74.69k £83.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A