Accounts and annual returns LAW ENFORCEMENT ACTION PARTNERSHIP UK/EUROPE CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1184079
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 13 February 2025 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 13 February 2025 13 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 February 2025 379 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 13 February 2025 379 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 11 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 12 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window