Financial history LAW ENFORCEMENT ACTION PARTNERSHIP UK/EUROPE CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION

Charity Number: 1184079
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £17.07k £39.31k £39.31k £79.76k £26.94k
Total expenditure £7.70k £5.53k £5.53k £43.61k £50.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A