POWER TO LIVE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide free and reduce-fee cognitive behavioural therapy to low-income groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income includes £9,950 from 1 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 12 February 2019: CIO registration
- PEACE OF MIND UK FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Raveen Bains | Trustee | 26 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Gray | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE PANAYIOTOU | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
TIEN KUEI | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.00k | £7.68k | £14.26k | £46.93k | £95.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £940 | £2.62k | £3.61k | £43.20k | £73.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.85k | £9.95k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 18 December 2023 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 18 December 2023 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 15 February 2021 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 15 February 2021 | 77 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: A) THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING THROUGH COGNITIVE BEHAVIOURAL THERAPY AND SUPPORT FOR THE RELIEF OF MENTAL DISTRESS AND SOCIAL ISOLATION FOR PEOPLE WITH NO OR LOW INCOME IN SOCIALLY DEPRIVED COMMUNITIES; AND B) THE PROVISION OF TRAINING FOR PSYCHOTHERAPISTS AND SELECTED COMMUNITY VOLUNTEERS IN EVIDENCE-BASED 4TH WAVE COGNITIVE BEHAVIOURAL THERAPY TREATMENT APPROACHES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
60 HORSHAM AVENUE
LONDON
N12 9BE
- Phone:
- 02083613219
- Email:
- info@powertolive.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window