DANCEWEST LONDON LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dance classes, community dance programmes, dance services for schools and public sector.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £43,938 from 3 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 02 August 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Whatson | Trustee | 24 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Whitney-Fish | Trustee | 31 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr LESLEY MAIN | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Giorgio Alexander Christou | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ida Valentine OSSONE MANE EMANE | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frances Elizabeth Hedges | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Michelle Ardley-Price | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maria Polydorou | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANYA LEONIE TODD | Trustee | 02 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £111.25k | £111.25k | £280.99k | £270.78k | £289.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.83k | £107.83k | £237.46k | £263.01k | £277.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £126.01k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £36.71k | £70.61k | £126.01k | £103.98k | £43.94k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 April 2024 | 90 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 April 2024 | 90 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC (OF ALL AGES AND ABILITIES) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE ART OF DANCE THROUGH CLASSES, WORKSHOPS AND PERFORMANCES ACROSS WEST LONDON, AND IN SO DOING NURTURE TALENT, DIVERSITY AND EXCELLENCE IN DANCE THROUGH PARTICIPATION AND LEARNING. TO IMPROVE THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH DANCE AND PERFORMING ARTS RELATED ACTIVITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sands End Arts & Community Centre
Peterborough Road
LONDON
SW6 3EZ
- Phone:
- 07494513079
- Email:
- info@dancewest.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window