COVENTRY MUSIC TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE MUSIC FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, WITH A PARTICULAR BUT NON-EXCLUSIVE FOCUS ON CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, BY IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT LIMITATION) PROMOTING THE PERFORMANCE, LEARNING, PRACTICE AND APPRECIATION OF MUSIC BY THE PEOPLE OF THE CITY OF COVENTRY AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Coventry City
Governance
- 15 February 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FLEUR JOANNA SEXTON BA/PGCE/DL | Chair | 15 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Benoit Granier | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Patton | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sinead Ouillon | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr GEOFF IAIN WILLCOCKS | Trustee | 15 February 2019 |
|
|||||
MARK STEELE | Trustee | 15 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/12/2019 | 15/12/2020 | 15/12/2021 | 15/12/2022 | 15/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £2.04k | £1.20k | £912 | £13.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £13 | £772 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 December 2023 | 09 December 2024 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 December 2023 | 09 December 2024 | 55 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 December 2022 | 11 December 2023 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 December 2022 | 12 March 2024 | 149 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 December 2021 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 December 2021 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE MUSIC FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, WITH A PARTICULAR BUT NON-EXCLUSIVE FOCUS ON CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, BY IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT LIMITATION) PROMOTING THE PERFORMANCE, LEARNING, PRACTICE AND APPRECIATION OF MUSIC BY THE PEOPLE OF THE CITY OF COVENTRY AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
COVENTRY CITY COUNCIL
COUNCIL HOUSE
EARL STREET
COVENTRY
CV1 5RR
- Phone:
- 02475 270 955
- Email:
- music@coventry.gov.uk
- Website:
-
CoventryMusicHub.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window