SWITCH THE PLAY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Switch the Play Foundation is the UK's only charity dedicated to supporting all sportspeople to successfully transition to life outside of sport. Evidence shows that leaving a life in sport can be really tough. We work with individuals, clubs, governing bodies, parents and organisations involved in the world of elite sport to help make transition to life outside sport a positive experience.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 04 February 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Few | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Hawes MBE | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Bould | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stacey Knight | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Christopher Mitchell | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Craig Francis Donaldson | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Penelope Mason | Trustee | 04 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Charles Brindley | Trustee | 04 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £209.42k | £201.18k | £193.65k | £277.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £218.60k | £252.39k | £230.60k | £269.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF, PARTICULARLY BY: (A) SUPPORTING THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF BENEFICIARIES WHO REQUIRE ASSISTANCE FINANCIALLY OR OTHERWISE TO HELP THEM TO PURSUE CAREERS OUTSIDE SPORT. (B) ADVANCING RESEARCH INTO THE DIFFICULTIES FACED BY BENEFICIARIES IN TRANSITIONING TO LIFE OUTSIDE ELITE SPORT. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SPORTSPEOPLE BOTH RETIRED AND WHO ARE ACTIVE IN COMPETITIVE SPORT, IN PARTICULAR THOSE WHO ARE AT RISK OF EXPERIENCING OR ARE EXPERIENCING POOR MENTAL HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING, MENTORING AND OTHER SUPPORT
Contact information
- Address:
-
WESTMINSTER HOUSE
10 WESTMINSTER ROAD
MACCLESFIELD
CHESHIRE
SK10 1BX
- Phone:
- 07919328389
- Email:
- rob.young@switchtheplay.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window