AVA'S ANGELS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing relief of sickness and suffering among children being cared for in hospital by providing items, services and emotional support for families to enable them to visit, spend quality time with and care for their children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 12 July 2018: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILLIP STUART AKERS | Chair | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
HELEN VICTORIA AKERS | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE LOUISE FENN | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.68k | £9.63k | £6.79k | £6.19k | £12.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.41k | £2.49k | £5.60k | £2.08k | £3.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND SUFFERING AMONG CHILDREN BEING CARED FOR IN AN INTENSIVE CARE OR HIGH DEPENDENCY UNIT SETTING WITHIN SUCH HOSPITALS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE BY PROVIDING ITEMS, SERVICES AND EMOTIONAL SUPPORT FOR FAMILIES DESIGNED TO ENABLE THEM TO VISIT, SPEND QUALITY TIME WITH AND CARE FOR SUCH CHILDREN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Barn House Mews
Ackleton
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV6 7JH
- Phone:
- 07951531748
- Email:
- team@avas-angels.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window