Financial history BREAKOUT YOUTH

Charity number: 1180296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £94.92k £142.26k £180.81k £232.46k £239.68k
Total expenditure £92.98k £96.19k £135.99k £219.56k £270.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £30.42k N/A £61.00k
Income from government grants £55.92k £109.16k £54.58k £87.28k N/A