FURLOCK HOLMES ANIMAL CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Furlock Holmes Animal Care provides a rehabilitation and rehoming service to animals in need as well as offering permanent sanctuary space to animals requiring ongoing treatment. Working closely with local vets, Furlock Holmes works to neuter and vaccinate where necessary and also aims to educate the general public on the importance of correct animal care and welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 10 September 2019
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Animals
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 16 August 2018: CIO registration
- FURLOCK HOLMES (Working name)
- FURLOCK HOLMES ANIMAL RESCUE (Working name)
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELEANOR BELL | Chair | 10 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH WATSON | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER FARRAND | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr HARRY MICHAEL GEORGE DANCE | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 10/09/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 10 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 322 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 322 days | |
Annual return | 10 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 688 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 688 days | |
Annual return | 10 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1053 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1053 days | |
Annual return | 10 September 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1418 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 September 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1418 days | |
Annual return | 10 September 2019 | 25 August 2020 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 September 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1783 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Aug 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT, SECURITY AND RE-HOMING FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS. 2) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WHO MAY BENEFIT FROM ANIMAL THERAPY, INVOLVING HANDLING AND INTERACTION WITH ANIMALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 SOUTHFIELD FARM COTTAGES
MICHELDEVER ROAD
WHITCHURCH
RG28 7JL
- Phone:
- 01256 973727
- Email:
- enquiries@furlockholmes.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window