GRIT STREET AID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grit Street Aid provides mobile assistance to around 50 rough sleepers and homeless each week throughout Greater Manchester. We offer help to people where they live on the street, providing food, clothing, and other basic essentials. We also advocate for our service users, in conjunction with the Street Support Network, and we hope to provide our service users with better access into services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 19 June 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Courcoux | Chair | 09 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Glen Anthony Tabois | Trustee | 30 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Ambrose Chisholm | Trustee | 21 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.21k | £40.02k | £27.27k | £21.67k | £35.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.90k | £33.33k | £29.68k | £32.92k | £12.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST THOSE WHO ARE HOMELESS, FACING HOMELESSNESS OR ROUGH SLEEPERS IN GREATER MANCHESTER WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS ON ACCOUNT OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF CLOTHING, BEDDING, FOOD AND DRINKS, HELPING TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF TEMPORARY ACCOMMODATION, INFORMATION, ADVICE, EMPLOYMENT AND EDUCATION ASSISTANCE, ALSO SIGNPOSTING ON ISSUES RELATED TO HEALTHCARE, ADDICTION AND HOUSING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Wythenshawe Forum Library
Civic Centre
Forum Grove
Wythenshawe
MANCHESTER
M22 5RX
- Phone:
- 07752294441
- Email:
- infogrit316@gmail.com
- Website:
-
gritstreetaid.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window